This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/30/2022 at 00:36:27 (UTC).

FRANCO vs DOMINGUEZ

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 FRANCO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DOMINGUEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4135

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LILIANA FRANCO

Defendant

JOSE ANTONIO DOMINGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN L. MAZZA

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

09/27/2022: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

09/27/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

09/27/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Electronic Service

09/27/2022: Notice of Electronic Service

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

09/29/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

09/29/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

09/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

09/29/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/29/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220929-02035.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/29/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220929-02035.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/26/2022; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Electronic Service; Filed By: LILIANA FRANCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: LILIANA FRANCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: LILIANA FRANCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: LILIANA FRANCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: LILIANA FRANCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of LILIANA FRANCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAZZA STEVEN L. ESQ.