This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/22/2021 at 11:03:54 (UTC).

FRANCO vs AECOM

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 FRANCO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against AECOM. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1504

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAIME FRANCO

Defendants

AECOM USA, INC.

AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

URS HOLDINGS, INC.

AECOM INC.

AECOM

AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES GLOBAL CORP.

AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

URS FEDERAL SERVICES INTERNATIONAL INC.

AECOM SERVICES, INC.

URS GROUP, INC.

URS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC.

URS

URS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC

URS CORPORATION

URS FEDERAL SERVICES

AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Susana Oganesian

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

03/19/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

03/19/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

03/19/2021: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

03/30/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

03/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAIME FRANCO

05/17/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAIME FRANCO

Notice To Adverse Party and to the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court, Central District Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441(a) and (b) Diversity

06/10/2021: Notice To Adverse Party and to the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court, Central District Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441(a) and (b) Diversity

Notice of Document Return.

06/10/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

06/15/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice To Adverse Party and to the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court, Central District Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332, 1441(a) and (b) Diversity; Filed By: AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.; URS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAIME FRANCO; Filed By: JAIME FRANCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/30/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9152 Receipt No.: 20210330-00699.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JAIME FRANCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JAIME FRANCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JAIME FRANCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000); Filed By: JAIME FRANCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAIME FRANCO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where URS GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where URS Federal Services is a litigant