This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/31/2021 at 00:53:33 (UTC).

FOX vs MINASIAN

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 FOX filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MINASIAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5227

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OWEN FOX

Defendants

RAZMIK MINASIAN

RAZMIK CONSTRUCTION , A SOLE PROPRIETORSHIP

RAZMIK CONSTRUCTION INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STAR CITY CONSTRUCTION INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORTAION

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey E. Fromberg

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

10/12/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of OWEN FOX

10/18/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of OWEN FOX

Summons Issued and Filed

10/12/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

10/12/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

10/12/2021: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of OWEN FOX

10/21/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of OWEN FOX

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of OWEN FOX

10/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of OWEN FOX

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of OWEN FOX

10/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of OWEN FOX

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of OWEN FOX; Filed By: OWEN FOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of OWEN FOX; Filed By: OWEN FOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of OWEN FOX; Filed By: OWEN FOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of OWEN FOX; Filed By: OWEN FOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/12/2021; Fine Description: Check #012805 Receipt No.: 20211012-00300.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 12/11/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: OWEN FOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: OWEN FOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: OWEN FOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: OWEN FOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of OWEN FOX

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FROMBERG JEFFREY E