This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/12/2023 at 00:28:11 (UTC).

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE vs AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AMAZON COM SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carol A. Greene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0109

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carol A. Greene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendants

AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC

HOMECO VA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN H. PARK

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Equitable Subrogation for Damages to Property

01/06/2023: Complaint for Equitable Subrogation for Damages to Property

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/06/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

01/06/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

01/06/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000)

01/10/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

01/10/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Remote Appearance for Hearing on Throughout the case on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

01/11/2023: Notice of Remote Appearance for Hearing on Throughout the case on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address. on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

01/11/2023: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address. on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

01/11/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

01/11/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/11/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230111-02349.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address. on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE; Filed By: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Remote Appearance for Hearing on Throughout the case on Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE; Filed By: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/10/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230110-02004.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/10/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230110-02004.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 03/07/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Equitable Subrogation for Damages to Property; Filed By: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Product Liability (Over $25,000) of FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less