Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 06:45:49 (UTC).

FINE vs BMW OF PALM SPRINGS

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 FINE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF PALM SPRINGS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are David M. Chapman and James Latting. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2762

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

David M. Chapman

James Latting

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIE FINE

Defendants

BMW OF PALM SPRINGS

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Steven Geller

Defendant Attorney

ANDREW K. STEFATOS

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MARIE FINE

07/26/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MARIE FINE

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MARIE FINE

07/26/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MARIE FINE

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MARIE FINE

07/23/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MARIE FINE

Summons Issued and Filed

06/08/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

06/08/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/08/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

06/08/2021: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Case Management Conference

06/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

06/10/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: James Latting; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/27/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210727-00066.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MARIE FINE; Filed By: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MARIE FINE; Filed By: MARIE FINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MARIE FINE; Filed By: MARIE FINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/10/2021; Fine Description: Check #4001830 Receipt No.: 20210610-00183.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MARIE FINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MARIE FINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MARIE FINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: MARIE FINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of MARIE FINE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF PALM SPRINGS is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant