This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 01:01:09 (UTC).

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE vs MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3927

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendant

RICARDO RESENDIZ MARTINEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Megan Ashley DeZotell

Megan A. Sarrail, Esq.

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

08/27/2021: Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

08/27/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

08/27/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

08/30/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

08/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

08/31/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

09/14/2021: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE; Filed By: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed By: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/30/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4190 Receipt No.: 20210830-00443.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARRAIL MEGAN ASHLEY