This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/19/2023 at 00:27:54 (UTC).

EVANS vs COMENITY SERVICING LLC

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 EVANS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COMENITY SERVICING LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0210

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERICA SIMMONS EVANS

Defendants

COMENITY SERVICING LLC

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC

TRANS UNION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD M. FRIEDMAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/17/2023: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

01/17/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

01/17/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Plaintiff's Affidavit of Venue Pursuant to Consumer Legal Remedies Act

01/17/2023: Plaintiff's Affidavit of Venue Pursuant to Consumer Legal Remedies Act

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

01/18/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

01/18/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

01/18/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/18/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230118-00475.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/18/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230118-00475.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 03/18/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Affidavit of Venue Pursuant to Consumer Legal Remedies Act; Filed By: ERICA SIMMONS EVANS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ERICA SIMMONS EVANS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ERICA SIMMONS EVANS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ERICA SIMMONS EVANS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint; Filed By: ERICA SIMMONS EVANS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of ERICA SIMMONS EVANS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less