This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/02/2021 at 21:57:26 (UTC).

Estate of: WILLIAM E. SIDNEY, IV

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 Estate of WILLIAM E SIDNEY, IV was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas H. Cahraman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0998

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas H. Cahraman

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

STACY SIDNEY

DANIELLE JOHNSON

VANESSA SIDNEY

Decedent

WILLIAM E. SIDNEY, IV

Administrator and Not Yet Classified

DANIELLE JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Steffanie Danielle Stelnick

 

Court Documents

Order for Probate - Order Appointing Administrator - Bond Required in the amount of $ 450,000.00 on Petition for Letters of Administration appointing DANIELLE JOHNSON

07/29/2021: Order for Probate - Order Appointing Administrator - Bond Required in the amount of $ 450,000.00 on Petition for Letters of Administration appointing DANIELLE JOHNSON

Minute Order: Hearing re Petition for Letters of Administration Appointing DANIELLE JOHNSON

07/23/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re Petition for Letters of Administration Appointing DANIELLE JOHNSON

VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT

07/13/2021: VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT

Proof of Publication of Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

06/23/2021: Proof of Publication of Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Hearing (Decedent's Estate or Trust) (DE-120) re: Petition for Probate for Letters of Administration

06/11/2021: Notice of Hearing (Decedent's Estate or Trust) (DE-120) re: Petition for Probate for Letters of Administration

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate with Proof of Service. (DE-121)

06/11/2021: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate with Proof of Service. (DE-121)

Notice of Department Assignment

06/03/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Dept. 8 - Notice of Telephonic Hearing on Petition for Letters of Administration appointing DANIELLE JOHNSON

06/03/2021: Dept. 8 - Notice of Telephonic Hearing on Petition for Letters of Administration appointing DANIELLE JOHNSON

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative. (DE-147)

06/03/2021: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative. (DE-147)

Certificate of Assignment. (Probate)

06/03/2021: Certificate of Assignment. (Probate)

Petition for Letters of Administration. (DE-111)

06/03/2021: Petition for Letters of Administration. (DE-111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Filing of Letters as to : DANIELLE JOHNSON; Expiration Date: 09/27/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Filing of Bond as to : DANIELLE JOHNSON; Expiration Date: 09/27/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order for Probate - Order Appointing Administrator - Bond Required in the amount of $ 450,000.00 on Petition for Letters of Administration appointing DANIELLE JOHNSON; Filed By: DANIELLE JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingProbate Notes: Hearing re Petition for Letters of Administration Appointing DANIELLE JOHNSON at 8:30 AM in Department 8; Details; RECOMMENDATIONS; Continue for proposed order/letters (otherwise recommended for approval); REQUESTS; Petitioner is/are Danielle Johnson, daughter; Petitioner(s) request(s) appointment as administrator, full authority, $450,000 bond; Personal Property - -0-, Real Property - $450,000; The Final Inventory and Appraisal shall be filed within four months after Letters are issued. Probate Code 8800(b).; The petition for final distribution of the estate or report of status of administration shall be filed no more than one year after Letters are issued. Probate Code 12200.; DEFICIENCIES; None; PROPOSED ORDER; No order submitted.; Letters not submitted.; Examined by S. Cruz on 06/22/21; Updated by S. Garcia on 07/06/21; Updated by S. Garcia on 07/20/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re Petition for Letters of Administration Appointing DANIELLE JOHNSON; Judicial Officer: Thomas H. Cahraman; Location/Courtroom: Department 8; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Filing of Order Appointing as to : DANIELLE JOHNSON; Expiration Date: 09/21/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re Petition for Letters of Administration Appointing DANIELLE JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Order re: Appointing Administrator; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT; Filed By: DANIELLE JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Publication of Notice of Petition to Administer Estate; Filed By: DANIELLE JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate with Proof of Service. (DE-121); Filed By: DANIELLE JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Court Reporter Fee Under 1 Hour; Amount: $30.00; Paid: $30.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/03/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3672 Receipt No.: 20210603-00724.1; Paid: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: First petition for letters of administration or letters testamentary/special letters of administration; Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/03/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3672 Receipt No.: 20210603-00724.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Dept. 8 - Notice of Telephonic Hearing on Petition for Letters of Administration appointing DANIELLE JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative. (DE-147); Filed By: DANIELLE JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Assignment. (Probate); Filed By: DANIELLE JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Letters of Administration. (DE-111); Filed By: DANIELLE JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER; Filed By: DANIELLE JOHNSON; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketFilings: Petition for Letters of Administration appointing DANIELLE JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STELNICK STEFFANIE DANIELLE