This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/01/2021 at 09:17:31 (UTC).

Estate of: ROSETTA J. TRENT

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Estate of ROSETTA J TRENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Evans. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0780

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

John G. Evans

 

Party Details

Executors and Not Yet Classified

GARY TRENT

BARBARA FERNANDEZ

PEGGY RITCHEY

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE ESTATE RECOVERY UNIT

FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

OWEN TRENT, JR

ALEX HUNSICKER

DARLA STEARMAN

Decedent

ROSETTA J. TRENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Nancy Noel

 

Court Documents

Order for Probate - Order Appointing Executor. Bond not required. on Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary appointing GARY TRENT

10/26/2021: Order for Probate - Order Appointing Executor. Bond not required. on Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary appointing GARY TRENT

Letters Testamentary Issued and Filed. (DE-150) on Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary appointing GARY TRENT

10/26/2021: Letters Testamentary Issued and Filed. (DE-150) on Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary appointing GARY TRENT

Minute Order: Hearing on Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary GARY TRENT

10/26/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary GARY TRENT

Supplemented Declaration of Petitioner in Support of the Petition for Probate

10/05/2021: Supplemented Declaration of Petitioner in Support of the Petition for Probate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate with Proof of Service. (DE-121) on Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary appointing GARY TRENT

10/05/2021: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate with Proof of Service. (DE-121) on Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary appointing GARY TRENT

Notice of In Person Court Hearing (Dept. PS3)

10/21/2021: Notice of In Person Court Hearing (Dept. PS3)

Notice of Document Return.

10/21/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Riverside County Mandatory Attachment to Form DE-111

10/21/2021: Riverside County Mandatory Attachment to Form DE-111

Minute Order: Hearing on Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary GARY TRENT

08/17/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary GARY TRENT

Supplemented Declaration of Petitioner in Support of the Petition for Probate

08/13/2021: Supplemented Declaration of Petitioner in Support of the Petition for Probate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate with Proof of Service. (DE-121)

08/03/2021: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate with Proof of Service. (DE-121)

Declaration in Support of Bond Waiver.

08/03/2021: Declaration in Support of Bond Waiver.

Acceptance of Trust

08/03/2021: Acceptance of Trust

Notice of Document Return.

06/17/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Department Assignment

06/15/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Dept. PS3 - Notice of Telephonic Hearing 8/17/2021

06/15/2021: Dept. PS3 - Notice of Telephonic Hearing 8/17/2021

Waiver of Bond by Heir of Beneficiary.

06/14/2021: Waiver of Bond by Heir of Beneficiary.

Declaration in Support of Bond Waiver.

06/14/2021: Declaration in Support of Bond Waiver.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • HearingProbate Notes: Hearing on Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary GARY TRENT at 8:45 AM in Department PS3; Details; RECOMMENDATIONS; Continue for documents to clear deficiencies; REQUESTS; Petitioner is/are Gary Trent, son; Petitioner requests appointment as executor, full authority and no bond.; Will waives bond; Personal Property - -0-, Real Property - $520,000; Will dated 11/19/98 deposited under case number PRIN2100782 offered.; Codicil dated 01/29/03 deposited under case number PRIN2100782; The Final Inventory and Appraisal shall be filed within four months after Letters are issued. Probate Code 8800(b).; The petition for final distribution of the estate or report of status of administration shall be filed no more than one year after Letters are issued. Probate Code 12200.; DEFICIENCIES; No Mandatory Attachment to DE-111 filed (Local Rules 7200, 7203, 7132 - Local Form RI-PR069); although all the required attachments are provided; Declaration in Support of Bond Waiver is insufficient as this form is obsolete and has been replaced by the Mandatory Attachment to the DE-111 (Local Form RI-PR069).; No Mandatory Attachment to DE-111 filed as alleged in supplement filed 10/05/21; PROPOSED ORDER; Order submitted; Letters submitted.; Examined by S. Cruz on 07/16/21; Updated by S. Garcia on 08/12/21; Updated by S. Garcia on 09/28/21; Updated by S. Garcia on 10/06/21; Reviewed by S. Garcia on 10/21/21. No new documents filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary GARY TRENT; Judicial Officer: John G. Evans; Location/Courtroom: Department PS3; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Filing of Final Inventory and Appraisal as to : GARY TRENT; Expiration Date: 02/23/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Filing of Accounting or Status Report as to : GARY TRENT; Expiration Date: 12/20/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Filing of Order Appointing as to : GARY TRENT; Expiration Date: 12/27/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary GARY TRENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Letters Testamentary Issued and Filed. (DE-150) on Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary appointing GARY TRENT; Filed By: GARY TRENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order for Probate - Order Appointing Executor. Bond not required. on Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary appointing GARY TRENT; Filed By: GARY TRENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/22/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5264 Receipt No.: 20211022-00044.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: First petition for letters of administration or letters testamentary/special letters of administration; Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/15/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5264 Receipt No.: 20210615-00423.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Dept. PS3 - Notice of Telephonic Hearing 8/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative.; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Waiver of Bond by Heir of Beneficiary.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration in Support of Bond Waiver.; Filed By: GARY TRENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative. (DE-147); Filed By: GARY TRENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Assignment. (Probate); Filed By: GARY TRENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary; Filed By: GARY TRENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketFilings: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary appointing GARY TRENT; Disposition: Judgment (Permanent Letters) 10/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRANCHISE TAX BOARD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nancy Noel