This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/22/2021 at 06:24:05 (UTC).

Estate of: JOSEPH GRACE BENOIST

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 Estate of JOSEPH GRACE BENOIST was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Evans. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1711

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

John G. Evans

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

GENEVIEVE C. BENOIST

CHANEL BRENNAN

RAYMOND J. BENOIST

CHRISTOPHER BENOIST

JOSEPH TINNEY

COURTNEY BENOIST FISH

CONDE LEE BENOIST

JANETTE APARICIO

ELIZABETH CHAVEZ

NANCY BENOIST

MARLENE A. CERVANTES

MARIA DE LOS ANGELES CISNEROS

SERGIO E. CISNEROS

GLORIA TOSCANO

HOWARD L. SANGER

NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A

Decedent

JOSEPH GRACE BENOIST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Lisa Killingbeck Berkeley

Peter Michael Bochnewich

Thomas Stephen Slovak

Eric Robert Adler

 

Court Documents

Notice of In Person Court Hearing (Dept. PS3) 3/11/2022

12/21/2021: Notice of In Person Court Hearing (Dept. PS3) 3/11/2022

Notice of Department Assignment

12/21/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Petition for Letters of Administration. (DE-111)

12/17/2021: Petition for Letters of Administration. (DE-111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing re Petition for Letters of Administration Appointing WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; Judicial Officer: John G. Evans; Location/Courtroom: Department PS3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Court Reporter Fee Under 1 Hour; Amount: $30.00; Paid: $30.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/21/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *8448 Receipt No.: 20211221-00425.1; Paid: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/21/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *8448 Receipt No.: 20211221-00425.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: First petition for letters of administration or letters testamentary/special letters of administration; Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/21/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *8448 Receipt No.: 20211221-00425.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of In Person Court Hearing (Dept. PS3) 3/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Letters of Administration. (DE-111); Filed By: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketFilings: Petition for Letters of Administration appointing WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Northern Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa Killingbeck Berkeley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOCHNEWICH PETER M. ESQ