This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/23/2021 at 05:59:58 (UTC).

ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA vs BOUKRIS

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BOUKRIS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0123

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA

HEATHER SCHOEN

Defendants

GUIDO BOUKRIS

GUY BOUKRIS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Lee O'Connor

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

04/01/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Return on Writ of Possession Satisfied

08/05/2021: Return on Writ of Possession Satisfied

Declaration in Support of issuance of Writ of Possession (RI-CI002)

05/17/2021: Declaration in Support of issuance of Writ of Possession (RI-CI002)

Judgment Unlawful Detainer; Honorable Randall D. White

05/14/2021: Judgment Unlawful Detainer; Honorable Randall D. White

Notice of Document Return.

04/26/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Certificate of Electronic Recording Monitor CRC 2.952(d)

04/23/2021: Certificate of Electronic Recording Monitor CRC 2.952(d)

Minute Order: Court Trial Unlawful Detainer on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA

04/23/2021: Minute Order: Court Trial Unlawful Detainer on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA

Request for Entry of Default on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA

04/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

04/15/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA

04/08/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA

Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA

04/08/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA

Request to Set Case for Trial Unlawful Detainer (UD-150)

04/08/2021: Request to Set Case for Trial Unlawful Detainer (UD-150)

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

04/02/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

04/01/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Request for Entry of Default on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA

03/30/2021: Request for Entry of Default on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

03/30/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA

03/26/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA

ANSWER - UNLAWFUL DETAINER on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA

03/26/2021: ANSWER - UNLAWFUL DETAINER on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Return on Writ of Possession Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/17/2021; Fine Description: Check #79745 Receipt No.: 20210517-00194.1; Paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration in Support of issuance of Writ of Possession (RI-CI002)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment Unlawful Detainer; Honorable Randall D. White; Filed By: ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA; HEATHER SCHOEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: (Proposed) Judgment after Hearing; Filed By: ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA; HEATHER SCHOEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • HearingType: Court Trial Unlawful Detainer on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4; Disposition: Held - Trial in progress

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Possession; Applies to: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA; For/Against: For - ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA For - HEATHER SCHOEN Against - ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Against - GUIDO BOUKRIS; Details; Possession: 15300 PALM DR SPC 210, DESERT HOT SPRINGS, CA 92240; Premises Address: 15300 Palm Dr DESERT HOT SPRINGS, CA, 92240

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Ordered; Type: Possession; Applies to: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA; For/Against: For - ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA For - HEATHER SCHOEN Against - GUIDO BOUKRIS; Details; Writ Fee: $40.00; Possession: 15300 Palm Dr, Spc 210, Desert Hot Springs, CA 92240; Premises Address: 15300 Palm Dr DESERT HOT SPRINGS, CA, 92240; Writ of Possession Issued for County: Riverside on 05/17/2021 - expires on 11/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: 10 Year Judgment Expiration; Expiration Date: 04/23/2031; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: ANSWER - UNLAWFUL DETAINER on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA; Filed By: GUIDO BOUKRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper in unlawful detainer amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $270.00; Paid: $270.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/15/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0230 Receipt No.: 20210315-00260.1; Paid: $270.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerks Notice of Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations (Unlawful Detainer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons - Unlawful Detainer - Eviction Issued and Filed (SUM-130); Filed By: ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA; HEATHER SCHOEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA; HEATHER SCHOEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA; HEATHER SCHOEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000); Filed By: ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA; HEATHER SCHOEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of ESTATE OF DANIEL DAROCHA; Disposition: Court Finding 04/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEE OCONNOR