This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 20:31:42 (UTC).

ESCOBAR vs TRACTOR SUPPLY CO

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 ESCOBAR filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TRACTOR SUPPLY CO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sunshine Sykes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0364

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sunshine Sykes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITLALLI ESCOBAR

Defendant

TRACTOR SUPPLY CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YALDA SATAR

Defendant Attorney

TIFFANY SHANAE WOODS

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Damages

01/27/2022: Complaint for Damages

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

01/27/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

01/27/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

01/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

01/27/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of CITLALLI ESCOBAR

02/01/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of CITLALLI ESCOBAR

Defendant Tractor Supply Company's Answer to Plaintiff Citlalli Escobar's Complaint on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of CITLALLI ESCOBAR

03/01/2022: Defendant Tractor Supply Company's Answer to Plaintiff Citlalli Escobar's Complaint on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of CITLALLI ESCOBAR

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

03/10/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice to the State Court and to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal in Federal Court on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of CITLALLI ESCOBAR

03/11/2022: Notice to the State Court and to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal in Federal Court on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of CITLALLI ESCOBAR

Notice of Document Return.

03/15/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Request for Dismissal

12/20/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/21/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221221-00085.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: CITLALLI ESCOBAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/15/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220315-00101.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice to the State Court and to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal in Federal Court on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of CITLALLI ESCOBAR; Filed By: TRACTOR SUPPLY CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/10/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220310-00470.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/10/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220310-00470.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant Tractor Supply Company's Answer to Plaintiff Citlalli Escobar's Complaint on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of CITLALLI ESCOBAR; Filed By: TRACTOR SUPPLY CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of CITLALLI ESCOBAR; Filed By: CITLALLI ESCOBAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/27/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220127-01963.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/27/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220127-01963.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages; Filed By: CITLALLI ESCOBAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CITLALLI ESCOBAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CITLALLI ESCOBAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CITLALLI ESCOBAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of CITLALLI ESCOBAR; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less