This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2023 at 01:11:49 (UTC).

ERSKINE vs SINHA

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 ERSKINE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SINHA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric A Keen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0200

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eric A Keen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RONALD ERSKINE

ROGER MOSSER

Defendants

RAJ K. SINHA, M.D

MUFFADAL AHMED TAHER, M.D

EISENHOWER MEDICAL CENTER

PALM DESERT RADIOLOGY MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

EISENHOWER HEALTH

EISENHOWER RADIOLOGY MEDICAL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT FRANK VAAGE

Defendant Attorneys

JENNIFER LOWIS

CLARK RAY HUDSON

RINA L. YOO

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

07/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

07/13/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Proof of Electronic Service - as to Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

07/05/2023: Proof of Electronic Service - as to Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

06/30/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

Notice of Document Return.

06/30/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Plaintiffs' Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

06/29/2023: Plaintiffs' Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

06/30/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

Proof of Service Re: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

06/30/2023: Proof of Service Re: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

06/30/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

06/27/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

Notice of Document Return.

05/02/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

05/02/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

05/01/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

04/28/2023: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

Defendant Raj K. Sinha, M.D.'s Answer on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

04/13/2023: Defendant Raj K. Sinha, M.D.'s Answer on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

03/28/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

03/07/2023: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

Eisenhower Medical Center's Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

03/07/2023: Eisenhower Medical Center's Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/18/2023

HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

HearingType: Ex Parte Hearing re: Ex Parte Application For Order Extending Trial Date; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Taken off calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Completed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/05/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230705-00233.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Electronic Service - as to Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE; Filed By: RONALD ERSKINE; ROGER MOSSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/03/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230703-00187.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/30/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230630-00627.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
02/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE; Filed By: RONALD ERSKINE; ROGER MOSSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/17/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230117-01847.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/17/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230117-01847.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000); Filed By: RONALD ERSKINE; ROGER MOSSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: RONALD ERSKINE; ROGER MOSSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: RONALD ERSKINE; ROGER MOSSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: RONALD ERSKINE; ROGER MOSSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketFilings: Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of RONALD ERSKINE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less