This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 06:01:34 (UTC).

ELIZONDO vs AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 ELIZONDO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AT T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Angel M. Bermudez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2973

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Angel M. Bermudez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUIS ADRIAN ELIZONDO

Defendant

AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Morris Rose

Defendant Attorney

Raymond William Bertrand

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

04/15/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

04/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued and Filed

04/06/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

04/06/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/06/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

04/06/2021: Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of LUIS ADRIAN ELIZONDO

05/06/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of LUIS ADRIAN ELIZONDO

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of LUIS ADRIAN ELIZONDO

06/17/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of LUIS ADRIAN ELIZONDO

Notice of Related Cases

07/23/2021: Notice of Related Cases

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

09/17/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Certificate of Mailing

09/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Request for Dismissal

12/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/22/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5145 Receipt No.: 20211222-00317.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: LUIS ADRIAN ELIZONDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Related Cases; Filed By: AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/18/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *2006 Receipt No.: 20210618-00318.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of LUIS ADRIAN ELIZONDO; Filed By: AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of LUIS ADRIAN ELIZONDO; Filed By: LUIS ADRIAN ELIZONDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/15/2021; Fine Description: Check #3456 Receipt No.: 20210415-00084.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: LUIS ADRIAN ELIZONDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: LUIS ADRIAN ELIZONDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: LUIS ADRIAN ELIZONDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000); Filed By: LUIS ADRIAN ELIZONDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of LUIS ADRIAN ELIZONDO; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 12/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSE ADAM MORRIS