This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/24/2023 at 09:09:06 (UTC).

ELIZARRARAS vs XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 ELIZARRARAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3730

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSE ELIZARRARAS

Defendants

XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC

XPO LAST MILE, INC

FRANCISCA ZENDEJAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

T. JOSHUA RITZ

Defendant Attorney

KEVIN M. ERWIN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration by XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC., XPO LAST MILE, INC.

02/22/2023: Minute Order: Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration by XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC., XPO LAST MILE, INC.

DEF XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC. AND XPO LAST MILE, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINT OPPO TO DEF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

02/15/2023: DEF XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC. AND XPO LAST MILE, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINT OPPO TO DEF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

Notice of Document Return.

02/14/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Declaration of T. Joshua Ritz

02/07/2023: Declaration of T. Joshua Ritz

Declaration in Support of His Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration

02/07/2023: Declaration in Support of His Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration

Request for Judicial Notice.

02/07/2023: Request for Judicial Notice.

Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

02/07/2023: Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint Incorrect Name of RXO LAST MILE, INC. on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

01/20/2023: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint Incorrect Name of RXO LAST MILE, INC. on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

Declaration of Christopher M Carrillo in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Completion of Arbitration

12/21/2022: Declaration of Christopher M Carrillo in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Completion of Arbitration

Declaration of Luis R Serrano in in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Completion of Arbitration

12/21/2022: Declaration of Luis R Serrano in in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Completion of Arbitration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Completion of Arbitration on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

12/21/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Completion of Arbitration on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Completion of Arbitration; Supporting Documents on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

12/21/2022: Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Completion of Arbitration; Supporting Documents on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Completion of Arbitration

12/21/2022: Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Completion of Arbitration

Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Completion of Arbitration on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

12/21/2022: Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Completion of Arbitration on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

10/24/2022: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

10/21/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

10/21/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

Notice of Department Assignment

09/01/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2023
  • HearingType: Status Conference re: Post-Arbitration; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration by XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC., XPO LAST MILE, INC.; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration by XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC., XPO LAST MILE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/15/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230215-01438.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: DEF XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC. AND XPO LAST MILE, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINT OPPO TO DEF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS OR STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS; Filed By: XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.; XPO LAST MILE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/07/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230207-01519.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of T. Joshua Ritz; Filed By: JOSE ELIZARRARAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration in Support of His Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed By: JOSE ELIZARRARAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS; Filed By: JOSE ELIZARRARAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/01/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220901-01830.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/01/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220901-01830.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JOSE ELIZARRARAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JOSE ELIZARRARAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JOSE ELIZARRARAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages; Filed By: JOSE ELIZARRARAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JOSE ELIZARRARAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less