This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/11/2023 at 09:11:25 (UTC).

DJAHANSHAHI vs DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 DJAHANSHAHI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric A Keen. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3900

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eric A Keen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI

Defendant

DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LILIUOKALANI H. MARTIN Daniel Azizi

Defendant Attorney

HEATHER D HEARNE

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

09/13/2022: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

09/13/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

09/13/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

09/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

09/13/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI

09/29/2022: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI

10/27/2022: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI

Notice to State Court of Removal of Civil Action on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI

10/28/2022: Notice to State Court of Removal of Civil Action on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/28/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221028-00427.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice to State Court of Removal of Civil Action on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI; Filed By: DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/27/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221027-01212.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/27/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221027-01212.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI; Filed By: DRIVETIME CAR SALES COMPANY, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/30/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220930-01321.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI; Filed By: SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/13/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220913-01815.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/13/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220913-01815.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000); Filed By: SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of SIAMAK DJAHANSHAHI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less