This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/31/2021 at 14:58:59 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs BUENO

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BUENO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4514

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

OCTAVIO BUENO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bora Song

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (Under $10,000) of DISCOVER BANK

06/24/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (Under $10,000) of DISCOVER BANK

Summons Issued and Filed

05/25/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

05/25/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (under $10,000)

05/25/2021: Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (under $10,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

05/27/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (Under $10,000) of DISCOVER BANK; Filed By: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/27/2021; Fine Description: Check #5613 Receipt No.: 20210527-00165.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Civil - Failure to file Default Judgment within 360 days as to DISCOVER BANK; Expiration Date: 05/20/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (under $10,000); Filed By: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Collections CRC 3.740 (Under $10,000) of DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Song, Bora