This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 19:58:25 (UTC).

DELGADILLO vs QIC US MANAGEMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 DELGADILLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against QIC US MANAGEMENT, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Raquel A. Marquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2719

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Raquel A. Marquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDA DELGADILLO

Defendants

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC

PIERCE MARTINEZ

PANDA RESTAURANT GROUP, INC

PROMENADE TEMECULA MALL

QIC US MANAGEMENT, INC

FEDERAL CLEANING CONTRACTORS, INC

ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CONCEPTS, LLC

FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES

FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Parham Nikfarjam

Defendant Attorneys

Artin Avetisove

Jefferson Scott Smith

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

04/14/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

04/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

04/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Issues Chamber Orders re: 10/5/2021 Case Management Conference

09/17/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Issues Chamber Orders re: 10/5/2021 Case Management Conference

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 9/17/2021

09/17/2021: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 9/17/2021

Case Management Statement

08/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

08/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

07/20/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

Request for Dismissal

05/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

05/20/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint on Federal Cleaning Contractors, Inc.

05/04/2021: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint on Federal Cleaning Contractors, Inc.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

05/04/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

05/03/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt as to PANDA RESTAURANT GROUP, INC

04/23/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt as to PANDA RESTAURANT GROUP, INC

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

04/16/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

04/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

04/14/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

04/14/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion Issues Chamber Orders re: 10/5/2021 Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Issues Chamber Orders re: 10/5/2021 Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 9/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement; Filed By: LINDA DELGADILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: LINDA DELGADILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/20/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210720-00397.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO; Filed By: PIERCE MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/21/2021; Fine Description: Check #5222 Receipt No.: 20210521-00056.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/07/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4190 Receipt No.: 20210407-00127.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/07/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4190 Receipt No.: 20210407-00125.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fees.; Filed By: LINDA DELGADILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: LINDA DELGADILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: LINDA DELGADILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: LINDA DELGADILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: LINDA DELGADILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LINDA DELGADILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QIC US MANAGEMENT, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CONCEPTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDERAL CLEANING CONTRACTORS INC. is a litigant