This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/22/2023 at 10:07:03 (UTC).

DEGNAN vs YOUNESI

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 DEGNAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against YOUNESI. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric A Keen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3792

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eric A Keen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA DEGNAN

Defendants

PALM DESERT DENTAL CENTER

HOA TRONG DAO, DDS

H. YOUNESI D.D.S., INC.

HAMID YOUNESI, D.D.S

KEVIN DAO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN STEVEN LOWENTHAL

BRIAN PATRICK KAMEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause For Failure to Appear

08/16/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause For Failure to Appear

Certificate of Mailing

08/16/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

08/15/2023: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Proof of Service via Mail and Email of Defendant's Motions to Compel; Declarations of Carol Najera-Luarca; Proposed Orders on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

08/15/2023: Proof of Service via Mail and Email of Defendant's Motions to Compel; Declarations of Carol Najera-Luarca; Proposed Orders on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

Proof of Service via Emailof Defendant's Motion to Compel; Declarations of Carol Najera-Luarca; Proposed Orders on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

08/10/2023: Proof of Service via Emailof Defendant's Motion to Compel; Declarations of Carol Najera-Luarca; Proposed Orders on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

Declaration of Carol J. Najera-Luarca in Support of Motion to Compel Responses of Plaintiff Patricia Degnan to Form Interrogatories, Set One

08/09/2023: Declaration of Carol J. Najera-Luarca in Support of Motion to Compel Responses of Plaintiff Patricia Degnan to Form Interrogatories, Set One

Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Verified Responses of Plaintiff to Form Interrogatories, Set One on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

08/09/2023: Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Verified Responses of Plaintiff to Form Interrogatories, Set One on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

Notice of Document Return.

08/10/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

08/10/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Declaration of Carol J. Najera-Luarca in Support of Motion to Compel Verified Responses of Plaintiff Patricia Degnan to Request for Production of Documents, Set One

08/09/2023: Declaration of Carol J. Najera-Luarca in Support of Motion to Compel Verified Responses of Plaintiff Patricia Degnan to Request for Production of Documents, Set One

Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Verified Responses of Plaintiff to Request for Production of Documents, Set One on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

08/09/2023: Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Verified Responses of Plaintiff to Request for Production of Documents, Set One on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

Notice of Document Return.

08/10/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Declaration of Carol J. Najera-Luarca in Support of Motion for Order Deeming Admitted Truth of Facts

08/09/2023: Declaration of Carol J. Najera-Luarca in Support of Motion for Order Deeming Admitted Truth of Facts

Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Deeming Admitted Truth of Facts; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration of Carol J. Najera-Luarca in Support on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

08/09/2023: Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Deeming Admitted Truth of Facts; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration of Carol J. Najera-Luarca in Support on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

Notice of Document Return.

08/10/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Declaration of Carol J. Najeraluarca in Support of Motion to Compel Verified Responses of Plaintiff Patricia Degnan to Special Interrogatories, Set One

08/09/2023: Declaration of Carol J. Najeraluarca in Support of Motion to Compel Verified Responses of Plaintiff Patricia Degnan to Special Interrogatories, Set One

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Verified Responses of Plaintiff Patricia Degnan to Special Interrogatories, Set One on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

08/09/2023: Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Verified Responses of Plaintiff Patricia Degnan to Special Interrogatories, Set One on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

Certificate of Mailing

05/03/2023: Certificate of Mailing

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment on; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion Motion for Order Deeming Admitted Truth of Facts by HOA TRONG DAO, DDS; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion Motion to Compel Verified Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One by HOA TRONG DAO, DDS; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion Motion to Compel Verified Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One by HOA TRONG DAO, DDS; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion Motion to Compel Verified Responses to Responses to Request for Production of Documents , Set One by HOA TRONG DAO, DDS; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to Appear Trial Setting Conference on 08/15/2023 as to PATRICIA DEGNAN; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/21/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230821-01709.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: [Proposed] Order Deming Admitted Truth of Facts on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN; Filed By: HOA TRONG DAO, DDS; Confidential: YES Confidential

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Hoa Trong Dao, D.D.S.' Motion to Compel Verified Responses of Plaintiff Patricia Degnan to Special Interrogatories, Set One on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN; Filed By: HOA TRONG DAO, DDS; Confidential: YES Confidential

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/07/2022; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: EFM20220907-00164.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000); Filed By: PATRICIA DEGNAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PATRICIA DEGNAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN; Filed By: PATRICIA DEGNAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN; Filed By: PATRICIA DEGNAN; Confidential: YES Confidential

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: PATRICIA DEGNAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN; Filed By: PATRICIA DEGNAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less