This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/08/2023 at 09:08:57 (UTC).

DEGNAN vs YOUNESI

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 DEGNAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against YOUNESI. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric A Keen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3792

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eric A Keen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA DEGNAN

Defendants

PALM DESERT DENTAL CENTER

HOA TRONG DAO, DDS

H. YOUNESI D.D.S., INC.

HAMID YOUNESI, D.D.S

KEVIN DAO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN STEVEN LOWENTHAL

BRIAN PATRICK KAMEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

03/06/2023: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

03/01/2023: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a)

03/02/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a)

Certificate of Mailing

03/02/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

03/02/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Document Return.

02/28/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

02/28/2023: Proof of Service on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

02/28/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Proof of Service on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

02/28/2023: Proof of Service on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

Notice of Document Return.

02/22/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

02/22/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Case Management Statement

02/17/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

02/15/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

Notice of Document Return.

12/30/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

12/30/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

12/05/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Proof of Service by Mail re: Defendant Hoa Trong Dao, D.D.S. aka Kevin Dao D.D.S. Erroneously Sued as Kevin Dao, DDS Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

12/05/2022: Proof of Service by Mail re: Defendant Hoa Trong Dao, D.D.S. aka Kevin Dao D.D.S. Erroneously Sued as Kevin Dao, DDS Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

Defendant Hoa Trong Dao, DDS aka Kevin Dao DDS' Answer on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

12/02/2022: Defendant Hoa Trong Dao, DDS aka Kevin Dao DDS' Answer on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a) as to HAMID YOUNESI, D.D.S., H. YOUNESI D.D.S., INC., BRIAN PATRICK KAMEL; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230306-01559.1; Paid: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230306-01559.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN; Filed By: HOA TRONG DAO, DDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/02/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230302-02199.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/07/2022; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: EFM20220907-00164.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000); Filed By: PATRICIA DEGNAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PATRICIA DEGNAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN; Filed By: PATRICIA DEGNAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN; Filed By: PATRICIA DEGNAN; Confidential: YES Confidential

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: PATRICIA DEGNAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN; Filed By: PATRICIA DEGNAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA DEGNAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less