This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 05:13:21 (UTC).

DE OLIVEIRA & DE OLIVEIRA

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 DE OLIVEIRA DE OLIVEIRA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Family Law Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0250

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARTIDES SAMPAIO DE OLIVEIRA

Respondent

WANDERLEI BARBOSA DE OLIVEIRA

Not Classified By Court

CALPERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jonathon Andrew Zitney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/04/2022; Fine Description: eSubmit *7341 Receipt No.: 20220204-00577.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons (FL-115) on 1st Amended Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by MARTIDES SAMPAIO DE OLIVEIRA; Filed By: MARTIDES SAMPAIO DE OLIVEIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/02/2022; Fine Description: eSubmit *7341 Receipt No.: 20220202-00585.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: 1st Amended Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by MARTIDES SAMPAIO DE OLIVEIRA; Filed By: MARTIDES SAMPAIO DE OLIVEIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketFilings: 1st Amended Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by MARTIDES SAMPAIO DE OLIVEIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/21/2022; Fine Description: eSubmit *7341 Receipt No.: 20220121-00443.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/19/2022; Fine Description: eSubmit *7341 Receipt No.: 20220119-00036.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amended Pleading on Joinder-Employee Benefit Plan on Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by MARTIDES SAMPAIO DE OLIVIERA; Filed By: MARTIDES SAMPAIO DE OLIVEIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons (FL-115) on Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by MARTIDES SAMPAIO DE OLIVIERA; Filed By: MARTIDES SAMPAIO DE OLIVEIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Petition or other first paper (including a joint petition) for dissolution of marriage or domestic partnership, legal separation, or nullity (GC70670B); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/14/2022; Fine Description: Check #1181 Receipt No.: 20220114-00511.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Failure to Bring Case to Trial or Judgment; Expiration Date: 01/13/2027; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Schedule a Case Status Conference; Expiration Date: 01/14/2023; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Case Management Date: Default / Response; Expiration Date: 03/15/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Family Law Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MARTIDES SAMPAIO DE OLIVEIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036); Filed By: MARTIDES SAMPAIO DE OLIVEIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage FL-100; Filed By: MARTIDES SAMPAIO DE OLIVEIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CalPERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZITNEY JONATHON ANDREW