This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/13/2021 at 11:08:34 (UTC).

DAWODU vs PISCIUNERI

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 DAWODU filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against PISCIUNERI. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0517

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOYIN DAWODU

Defendants

INLAND EMPIRE LATINO LAWYERS ASSOCIATION INC.

GENE ARTHUR MENESES

SYLVIA QUISTORF

LAURA PISCIUNERI

SYLVIA QUISTORF, IN HER CAPACITY AS EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF INLAND EMPIRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JENNIFER KAY SAUNDERS

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

09/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Receipt for Record on Appeal Appeal packet sent to DCA on Appeal of Judgment TOYIN DAWODU

10/06/2021: Receipt for Record on Appeal Appeal packet sent to DCA on Appeal of Judgment TOYIN DAWODU

Notice of Appeal of Judgment in Superior Court with No Deposit on Appeal of Judgment TOYIN DAWODU

09/30/2021: Notice of Appeal of Judgment in Superior Court with No Deposit on Appeal of Judgment TOYIN DAWODU

Reply to Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration

09/17/2021: Reply to Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration

Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration of Judgment

09/03/2021: Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration of Judgment

Notice of Document Return.

08/30/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Minute Order: Hearing on Anti-SLAPP Motion (Special Motion to Strike)

08/18/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Anti-SLAPP Motion (Special Motion to Strike)

Proof of Service by Mail re: Notice of Motion to Strike/Declarations(s)/Request to take Judicial Notice/Proposed Order by Certified Mail RRR on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of TOYIN DAWODU

08/12/2021: Proof of Service by Mail re: Notice of Motion to Strike/Declarations(s)/Request to take Judicial Notice/Proposed Order by Certified Mail RRR on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of TOYIN DAWODU

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

08/09/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Certificate of Mailing

08/03/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Proof of Service VIA U.S. Mail of Motion to Strike and supporting documents on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of TOYIN DAWODU

07/08/2021: Proof of Service VIA U.S. Mail of Motion to Strike and supporting documents on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of TOYIN DAWODU

Notice of Document Return.

07/09/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted

07/08/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted

Request to take Judicial Notice in support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike

07/06/2021: Request to take Judicial Notice in support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike Complaint on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of TOYIN DAWODU

07/06/2021: Motion to Strike Complaint on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of TOYIN DAWODU

Notice of hearing on Demurrer and Motion to Strike and Demurrer and Motion to Strike Complaint/MPA on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of TOYIN DAWODU

06/30/2021: Notice of hearing on Demurrer and Motion to Strike and Demurrer and Motion to Strike Complaint/MPA on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of TOYIN DAWODU

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of TOYIN DAWODU

06/03/2021: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of TOYIN DAWODU

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Receipt for Record on Appeal Appeal packet sent to DCA on Appeal of Judgment TOYIN DAWODU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Default on Appeal (Superior Court) for failure to Timely submit to the Superior Court Clerk either the initial $100.00 deposit, a request to waive fees. or a current order granting fee waiver on Appeal of Judgment TOYIN DAWODU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • FinancialCOLLECTION HISTORY; Debtor Number: 2201761; Debt Type: FEE; Collection Status: ECD; Total Amount Assessed: $100.00; Original Delinquent Amount: $100.00; Current Balance: $100.00; Deposit for Preparation of Clerk's Transcript; Debt Type: Fee; Due Date: 10/05/2021; Total Amount Assessed: $100.00; Original Delinquent Amount: $100.00; Current Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notification of Filing Notice of Appeal on Appeal of Judgment TOYIN DAWODU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notification of Filing Notice of Appeal on Appeal of Judgment TOYIN DAWODU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • HearingType: Notice of hearing on Demurrer and Motion to Strike and Demurrer and Motion to Strike Complaint/MPA; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Taken off calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Demurrer on; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Deposit for Preparation of Clerk's Transcript; Amount: $100.00; Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of TOYIN DAWODU; Filed By: TOYIN DAWODU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/01/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4312 Receipt No.: 20210201-00168.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: TOYIN DAWODU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: TOYIN DAWODU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: TOYIN DAWODU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000); Filed By: TOYIN DAWODU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of TOYIN DAWODU

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Kay Saunders