This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/24/2022 at 02:52:03 (UTC).

CULLEN vs SMALL

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 CULLEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SMALL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1477

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL CULLEN

Defendants

STEPHEN WAYNE SMALL

VICTORIA SMALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VINCENT BLEDSOE

Defendant Attorney

ALISSA J GALES

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

04/15/2022: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

04/15/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

04/15/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

04/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

04/25/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL CULLEN

05/10/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL CULLEN

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL CULLEN

05/10/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL CULLEN

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL CULLEN

06/03/2022: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL CULLEN

Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL CULLEN

06/03/2022: Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL CULLEN

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/06/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220606-00545.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/06/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220606-00545.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/06/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220606-00545.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL CULLEN; Filed By: STEPHEN WAYNE SMALL; VICTORIA SMALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL CULLEN; Filed By: STEPHEN WAYNE SMALL; VICTORIA SMALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/11/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220511-00293.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL CULLEN; Filed By: MICHAEL CULLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL CULLEN; Filed By: MICHAEL CULLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/25/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220425-01034.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/25/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220425-01034.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MICHAEL CULLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MICHAEL CULLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MICHAEL CULLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: MICHAEL CULLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MICHAEL CULLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALES ALISSA J