This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 07:02:17 (UTC).

CRABTREE vs ROMAIN

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 CRABTREE filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against ROMAIN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey M. Zimel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2090

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey M. Zimel

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

REGINA ROMAIN

ROBERT CRABTREE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Michelle Denise Strickland

Dominic J Rodono

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders; Judicial Officer: Jeffrey M. Zimel; Location/Courtroom: Department S101; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders; Judicial Officer: Jeffrey M. Zimel; Location/Courtroom: Department S101; Disposition: Continued - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Request to Continue Hearing (Temporary Restraining Order) on Request for Civil Harassment (Violence) of ROBERT CRABTREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing. (Statement of Disqualification/Challenge for Cause) on Request for Civil Harassment (Violence) of ROBERT CRABTREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Request for Civil Harassment (Violence) of ROBERT CRABTREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order Striking Respondent's Motion to Disqualify Judge Jeffrey Zimel and Verified Answer on Request for Civil Harassment (Violence) of ROBERT CRABTREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders; Judicial Officer: Jeffrey M. Zimel; Location/Courtroom: Department S101; Disposition: Continued - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ROBERT CRABTREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Temporary Restraining Order on Request for Civil Harassment (Violence) of ROBERT CRABTREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Court Hearing - Civil Harassment Prevention (CH-109) on Request for Civil Harassment (Violence) of ROBERT CRABTREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CH-130); Filed By: ROBERT CRABTREE; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Confidential CLETS Information (CLETS-001); Filed By: ROBERT CRABTREE; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ROBERT CRABTREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - Violence (CH-100); Filed By: ROBERT CRABTREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketFilings: Request for Civil Harassment (Violence) of ROBERT CRABTREE; Disposition: Court Finding 07/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODONO DOMINIC J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRICKLAND MICHELLE