This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 12:18:01 (UTC).

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE vs SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 721

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 721. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2300

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Respondent

SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 721

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sergio Bent

Respondent Attorney

Maria Keegan Myers

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Order re: Denying Petition to Vacate Arbitration and Granting Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Final Judgment on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

10/18/2021: Notice of Entry of Order re: Denying Petition to Vacate Arbitration and Granting Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Final Judgment on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

[Proposed] Order Denying Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award and Granting Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Final Judgment on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

09/23/2021: [Proposed] Order Denying Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award and Granting Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Final Judgment on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

[Proposed] Order Denying Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award and Granting Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Final Judgment on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

09/23/2021: [Proposed] Order Denying Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award and Granting Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Final Judgment on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Minute Order: Hearing on Petition re: Arbitration Award

09/20/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Petition re: Arbitration Award

Minute Order: Hearing on Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award

09/20/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award

Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Confirm Arbitrator's Award by SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 721

09/20/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Confirm Arbitrator's Award by SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 721

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

09/20/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

TENTATIVE RULING AS OF 9-20-21 -ORDERED FILED-

09/20/2021: TENTATIVE RULING AS OF 9-20-21 -ORDERED FILED-

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

09/13/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Certificate of Mailing

08/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

08/25/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Reply in Support of its Motion to Vacate Arbitrator's Award on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

08/23/2021: Reply in Support of its Motion to Vacate Arbitrator's Award on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

08/18/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Declaration of Maria Keegan Myers in Support of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award

08/12/2021: Declaration of Maria Keegan Myers in Support of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award

Motion to Confirm Arbitrator's Award on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

08/12/2021: Motion to Confirm Arbitrator's Award on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Respondent's Opposition to Petition to Vacate Arbitrator's Award on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

08/12/2021: Respondent's Opposition to Petition to Vacate Arbitrator's Award on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Notice of Document Return.

08/12/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Entry of Order re: Joint Stipulation to Continue July 28, 2021 Hearing Date on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

07/26/2021: Notice of Entry of Order re: Joint Stipulation to Continue July 28, 2021 Hearing Date on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Entry of Order re: Denying Petition to Vacate Arbitration and Granting Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Final Judgment on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE; Filed By: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order Denying Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award and Granting Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Final Judgment; Filed By: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: [Proposed] Order Denying Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award and Granting Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Final Judgment on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE; Filed By: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Petition re: Arbitration Award; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Confirm Arbitrator's Award by SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 721; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Petition re: Arbitration Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Confirm Arbitrator's Award by SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed By: COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/14/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1752 Receipt No.: 20210614-00344.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Verified Response of Service Employees International Union, Local 721 to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award and Cross-Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE; Filed By: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE; Filed By: COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/27/2021; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: 20210527-00236.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing on Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition re: Confirm/Correct/Vacate Arbitration Award (Over $25,000); Filed By: COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketFilings: Petition re: Arbitration Award (Over $25,000) of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE; Disposition: Court Finding 09/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Service Employees International Union, Local 1021 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MYERS MARIA KEEGAN