This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/25/2021 at 18:03:27 (UTC).

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE vs BENNETT

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against BENNETT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0294

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Respondent

DUANE E BENNETT

Interested Party

EVA AGUILAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sergio Bent

Interested Party Attorney

Robert Michael Rabe

 

Court Documents

Order Sustaining Demurrer to Petition for Writ of Mandate

09/09/2021: Order Sustaining Demurrer to Petition for Writ of Mandate

Stipulation and Order concerning the Retitling of the Matter and Dismissal of Duane E. Bennett

08/04/2021: Stipulation and Order concerning the Retitling of the Matter and Dismissal of Duane E. Bennett

Notice of Document Return.

08/20/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Tentative Ruling for 08/03/2021

08/04/2021: Tentative Ruling for 08/03/2021

Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)

08/03/2021: Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)

Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on Petition for Writ of Mandate of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

08/03/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on Petition for Writ of Mandate of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Real Party In Interest Eva Aguilar's Supplemental Reply to Petitioner's Supplement Opposition To Respondent's Demurrer on Petition for Writ of Mandate of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

07/21/2021: Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Real Party In Interest Eva Aguilar's Supplemental Reply to Petitioner's Supplement Opposition To Respondent's Demurrer on Petition for Writ of Mandate of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Notice of Document Return.

07/21/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Reply to Petitioner's Supplemental Opposition To Respondent's Demurrer on Petition for Writ of Mandate of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

07/20/2021: Reply to Petitioner's Supplemental Opposition To Respondent's Demurrer on Petition for Writ of Mandate of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Petitioner County of Riverside's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Eva Aguilar's Demurrer on Petition for Writ of Mandate of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

07/15/2021: Petitioner County of Riverside's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Eva Aguilar's Demurrer on Petition for Writ of Mandate of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Stipulation Concerning the Retitling of the Matter and Dismissal of Duane E. Bennett

06/21/2021: Stipulation Concerning the Retitling of the Matter and Dismissal of Duane E. Bennett

Supplemental brief in support of demurrer

06/15/2021: Supplemental brief in support of demurrer

Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

06/04/2021: Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Petition for Writ of Mandate of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

06/04/2021: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Petition for Writ of Mandate of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Petition for Writ of Mandate

06/04/2021: Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Petition for Writ of Mandate

Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)

05/06/2021: Minute Order: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus)

Minute Order: Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Petition for Writ of Mandate; Memorandum of points and authorities; Declaration of Robert Rabe

05/06/2021: Minute Order: Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Petition for Writ of Mandate; Memorandum of points and authorities; Declaration of Robert Rabe

Reply to the Opposition to Demurrer to Petition for Writ of Mandate

04/28/2021: Reply to the Opposition to Demurrer to Petition for Writ of Mandate

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order Sustaining Demurrer to Petition for Writ of Mandate; Filed By: EVA AGUILAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: (Proposed) Order sustaining Demurrer to Petition for writ of mandate; Filed By: EVA AGUILAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • FinancialCOLLECTION HISTORY; Debtor Number: 2191137; Debt Type: FEE; Collection Status: ECD; Total Amount Assessed: $470.00; Original Delinquent Amount: $470.00; Current Balance: $450.00; Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Debt Type: Fee; Due Date: 08/04/2021; Total Amount Assessed: $450.00; Original Delinquent Amount: $450.00; Current Balance: $450.00; Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Debt Type: Fee; Due Date: 08/04/2021; Total Amount Assessed: $20.00; Original Delinquent Amount: $20.00; Current Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $0.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/04/2021; Fine Description: No Fee Case Receipt No.: 20210804-00614.1; Paid: $20.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/04/2021; Fine Description: Void / Reversal, Reason: Other, Fees applied in error. Receipt No.: 20210804-00614.2; Paid: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $0.00; Balance: $450.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/04/2021; Fine Description: No Fee Case Receipt No.: 20210804-00614.1; Paid: $450.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/04/2021; Fine Description: Void / Reversal, Reason: Other, Fees applied in error. Receipt No.: 20210804-00614.2; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Stipulation and Order concerning the Retitling of the Matter and Dismissal of Duane E. Bennett; Filed By: DUANE E BENNETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Tentative Ruling for 08/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • HearingType: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus); Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Demurrer on Petition for Writ of Mandate of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of Demurrer; Filed By: EVA AGUILAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Petition for Writ of Mandate; Memorandum of points and authorities; Declaration of Robert Rabe on Petition for Writ of Mandate of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE; Filed By: EVA AGUILAR; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/29/2021; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: 20210129-00966.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Status Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petitioner County of Riverside's Petition for Writ of Mandate Pursuant to code of civil procedure sections 1085 and 1094.5; Filed By: COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketFilings: Petition for Writ of Mandate of COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RABE ROBERT MICHAEL