This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 17:30:24 (UTC).

CORTEZ vs PRESTIGE AUTOS

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 CORTEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PRESTIGE AUTOS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2903

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CELIA CORTEZ

JOHN C BERGER

Defendants

PRESTIGE AUTOS

MECHANICS BANK

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Denise Victoria Foley

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTIAN JEAN GASCOU

 

Court Documents

Affidavit re: Venue

06/24/2021: Affidavit re: Venue

Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

06/24/2021: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

06/24/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

06/24/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

07/06/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

07/06/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer of Hudson Insurance Company to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CELIA CORTEZ

08/13/2021: Answer of Hudson Insurance Company to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CELIA CORTEZ

Affidavit re: Venue

06/24/2021: Affidavit re: Venue

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/18/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210818-00358.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer of Hudson Insurance Company to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CELIA CORTEZ; Filed By: HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/06/2021; Fine Description: Check #4018793 Receipt No.: 20210706-00331.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CELIA CORTEZ; JOHN C BERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CELIA CORTEZ; JOHN C BERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CELIA CORTEZ; JOHN C BERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: CELIA CORTEZ; JOHN C BERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Affidavit re: Venue; Filed By: CELIA CORTEZ; JOHN C BERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Affidavit re: Venue; Filed By: CELIA CORTEZ; JOHN C BERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CELIA CORTEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRESTIGE AUTOS is a litigant

Latest cases where MECHANICS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN