This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 02:15:40 (UTC).

CORTEZ vs PRESTIGE AUTOS

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 CORTEZ filed an Other lawsuit against PRESTIGE AUTOS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1456

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JOHN C. BERGER

CELIA CORTEZ

Respondents

MECHANICS BANK

PRESTIGE AUTOS

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Denise V. Foley

 

Court Documents

Notice of Document Return.

07/16/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Request for Dismissal

06/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of CELIA CORTEZ

06/22/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of CELIA CORTEZ

Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Certificate of Counsel originally filed on 05/07/21

05/24/2021: Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Certificate of Counsel originally filed on 05/07/21

Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Summons originally filed on 05/07/21

05/24/2021: Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Summons originally filed on 05/07/21

Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

05/24/2021: Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of CELIA CORTEZ

05/24/2021: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of CELIA CORTEZ

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Denied on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of CELIA CORTEZ

05/13/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Denied on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of CELIA CORTEZ

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted

05/13/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted

Violation of the Consumer Legal Remedies Act

05/07/2021: Violation of the Consumer Legal Remedies Act

Notice of Department Assignment

05/11/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Hearing on Petition on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of CELIA CORTEZ

05/11/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of CELIA CORTEZ

Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

05/11/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

Affidavit re: Venue as to John C Berger

05/07/2021: Affidavit re: Venue as to John C Berger

Affidavit re: Venue as to Celia Cortez

05/07/2021: Affidavit re: Venue as to Celia Cortez

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Violation of the Consumer Legal Remedies Act; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: CELIA CORTEZ; JOHN C. BERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of CELIA CORTEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialCOLLECTION HISTORY; Debtor Number: 2180126; Debt Type: FEE; Collection Status: ECD; Total Amount Assessed: $450.00; Original Delinquent Amount: $450.00; Current Balance: $450.00; Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Debt Type: Fee; Due Date: 05/27/2021; Total Amount Assessed: $450.00; Original Delinquent Amount: $450.00; Current Balance: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • HearingType: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of CELIA CORTEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Certificate of Counsel originally filed on 05/07/21

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Order re: Order on Court Fee Waiver submitted by John C. Berger; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001); Filed By: JOHN C. BERGER; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001); Filed By: CELIA CORTEZ; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CELIA CORTEZ; JOHN C. BERGER; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CELIA CORTEZ; JOHN C. BERGER; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Violation of the Consumer Legal Remedies Act; Filed By: CELIA CORTEZ; JOHN C. BERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Affidavit re: Venue as to John C Berger; Filed By: CELIA CORTEZ; JOHN C. BERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Affidavit re: Venue as to Celia Cortez; Filed By: CELIA CORTEZ; JOHN C. BERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketFilings: Other Petition (Over $25,000) of CELIA CORTEZ; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 06/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRESTIGE AUTOS is a litigant

Latest cases where MECHANICS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOLEY DENISE V. ESQ.