This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 09:01:29 (UTC).

COLOR BRITE LIMITES PARTNERSHIP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED PARNERSHIP vs SALUTO

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 COLOR BRITE LIMITES PARTNERSHIP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED PARNERSHIP filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against SALUTO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are David M. Chapman and James Latting. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1686

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

David M. Chapman

James Latting

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IRA SERVICES TRUST COMPANY FBO THOMAS VASEY ACC.# 707934

JONATHAN LU

COLOR BRITE LIMITES PARTNERSHIP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED PARNERSHIP

LISETTE KREMER, TRUSTEE OF THE KREMER TRUST

SOPHIA LU

Defendants

DENISE SALUTO

NOW CONCEPTS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

The Chang Firm

Randy Chang

 

Court Documents

Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice (Over $25,000) of COLOR BRITE LIMITES PARTNERSHIP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED PARNERSHIP

07/16/2021: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice (Over $25,000) of COLOR BRITE LIMITES PARTNERSHIP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED PARNERSHIP

Notice of Case Management Conference

04/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

04/12/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Complaint for Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice (Over $25,000)

04/02/2021: Complaint for Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/02/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

04/02/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

04/02/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: James Latting; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice (Over $25,000) of COLOR BRITE LIMITES PARTNERSHIP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED PARNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/12/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *2476 Receipt No.: 20210412-00349.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: COLOR BRITE LIMITES PARTNERSHIP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED PARNERSHIP; LISETTE KREMER, TRUSTEE OF THE KREMER TRUST; IRA SERVICES TRUST COMPANY FBO THOMAS VASEY ACC.# 707934; SOPHIA LU; JONATHAN LU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: COLOR BRITE LIMITES PARTNERSHIP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED PARNERSHIP; LISETTE KREMER, TRUSTEE OF THE KREMER TRUST; IRA SERVICES TRUST COMPANY FBO THOMAS VASEY ACC.# 707934; SOPHIA LU; JONATHAN LU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: COLOR BRITE LIMITES PARTNERSHIP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED PARNERSHIP; LISETTE KREMER, TRUSTEE OF THE KREMER TRUST; IRA SERVICES TRUST COMPANY FBO THOMAS VASEY ACC.# 707934; SOPHIA LU; JONATHAN LU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice (Over $25,000); Filed By: COLOR BRITE LIMITES PARTNERSHIP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED PARNERSHIP; LISETTE KREMER, TRUSTEE OF THE KREMER TRUST; IRA SERVICES TRUST COMPANY FBO THOMAS VASEY ACC.# 707934; SOPHIA LU; JONATHAN LU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice (Over $25,000) of COLOR BRITE LIMITES PARTNERSHIP, AN ARIZONA LIMITED PARNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG RANDY