This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/01/2023 at 09:06:52 (UTC).

COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY vs GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/28/2022 COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel Bustamante. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2994

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Manuel Bustamante

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

REYNOLD'S BUICK, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

COURTESY CHEVROLET CENTER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PARADISE CHEVROLET CADILLAC, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEST BEST & KRIEGER

Attorney at BEST BEST & KRIEGER

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

07/28/2022: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

07/28/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

07/28/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

08/03/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

08/03/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

09/30/2022: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

09/30/2022: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

Request for Dismissal

12/30/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to DEFENDANT(S); Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/12/2023; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20230112-00285.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/03/2022; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20220803-00768.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/03/2022; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20220803-00768.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY; Disposition: Dismissal After Settlement Conference 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less