This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/17/2022 at 11:29:14 (UTC).

CITY OF TEMECULA, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION & LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 CITY OF TEMECULA, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY was filed as a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0256

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF TEMECULA, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendants

LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ANY AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN HAVING OR CLAIMING TO HAVE ANY TITLE OR INTEREST IN OR TO THE PROPERTY SOUGHT TO BE CONDEMNED HEREIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAULA BAEZA

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000)

01/06/2022: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

01/06/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/06/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000)

01/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

01/20/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Document Return.

01/20/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Summons Issued and Filed

01/20/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department S303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/01/2022; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20220201-00560.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/20/2022; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20220120-00586.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/20/2022; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20220120-00586.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CITY OF TEMECULA, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 03/07/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CITY OF TEMECULA, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CITY OF TEMECULA, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000); Filed By: CITY OF TEMECULA, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF TEMECULA, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant