This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 03:14:03 (UTC).

CITY OF PERRIS & WHITNEY

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 CITY OF PERRIS WHITNEY was filed as a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carol A. Greene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2505

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carol A. Greene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF PERRIS

Defendants

DOUGLAS WHITNEY

26TH CORPORATION

32ND CORPORATION

SUMMER CREEKHOMES

KEN THAYER

MARTIN LEE COULSON AND TAMARA COULSON

KENAN C THAYER AND CHRISTINA M THAYER

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

INTERNAL REVENUESERVICE

KAREN DEAQUINO AND LINDA DEAQUINO

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE,LIEN OR INTEREST IN OR TO THE PROPERTY SOUGHT TO BE CONDEMNED HEREIN

CHRIS SHEPARD

SUMMER CREEK HOMES

SHEPARD INVESTMENTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicolas D Papajohn

Defendant Attorneys

Gregg M Gu

CHRISTOPHER D LOCKWOOD

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

10/25/2021: VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

Notice of Document Return.

10/21/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

10/21/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice OF DEPOSIT

10/15/2021: Notice OF DEPOSIT

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

10/15/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

09/13/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

09/17/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

09/17/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

09/30/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

09/17/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

09/13/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Affidavit of Due Diligence re: Martin Lee Coulson and Tamara Coulson Family Trust

09/13/2021: Affidavit of Due Diligence re: Martin Lee Coulson and Tamara Coulson Family Trust

Affidavit of Due Diligence re: Karen Deaquino

09/13/2021: Affidavit of Due Diligence re: Karen Deaquino

Affidavit of Due Diligence re: Linda Deaquino

09/13/2021: Affidavit of Due Diligence re: Linda Deaquino

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

09/13/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

Affidavit of Due Diligence re: Kenan C. Thayer and Christina M. Thayer

09/13/2021: Affidavit of Due Diligence re: Kenan C. Thayer and Christina M. Thayer

Affidavit of Due Diligence re: Ken Thayer

09/13/2021: Affidavit of Due Diligence re: Ken Thayer

Affidavit of Due Diligence re: Summer Creek Homes

09/13/2021: Affidavit of Due Diligence re: Summer Creek Homes

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/25/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211025-00327.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS; Filed By: SHEPARD INVESTMENTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF DEPOSIT; Filed By: CITY OF PERRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS; Filed By: CITY OF PERRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS; Filed By: CITY OF PERRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS; Filed By: CITY OF PERRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS; Filed By: CITY OF PERRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS; Filed By: CITY OF PERRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/09/2021; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: 20210609-00686.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CITY OF PERRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CITY OF PERRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CITY OF PERRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000); Filed By: CITY OF PERRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Filed By: CITY OF PERRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of CITY OF PERRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Summer Creek 640 LP is a litigant

Latest cases where SHEPPARD INVESTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where FRANCHISE TAX BOARD is a litigant

Latest cases where Internal Revenue Service is a litigant