This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 07:57:41 (UTC).

CITY OF PALM SPRINGS vs. 1875 NORTH PALM CANYON DRIVE, PALM SPRINGS, CALIFORNIA 92262

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 CITY OF PALM SPRINGS filed a Property - Land lawsuit against 1875 NORTH PALM CANYON DRIVE, PALM SPRINGS, CALIFORNIA 92262. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0076

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

Respondent

1875 NORTH PALM CANYON DRIVE, PALM SPRINGS, CALIFORNIA 92262

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MICHELINA HASSELL

 

Court Documents

Abatement Warrant Return on Application for Inspection/Abatement/Seizure Warrant of CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

04/14/2021: Abatement Warrant Return on Application for Inspection/Abatement/Seizure Warrant of CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

Declaration of City Engineer Joel Montalvo In Support of Application for Extension of Abatement Warrant

02/17/2021: Declaration of City Engineer Joel Montalvo In Support of Application for Extension of Abatement Warrant

Notice of Department Assignment

01/19/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Request for Judicial Notice.

01/19/2021: Request for Judicial Notice.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

01/14/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Application/Declaration/Petition for Inspection/Abatement/Seizure Warrant

01/14/2021: Application/Declaration/Petition for Inspection/Abatement/Seizure Warrant

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

01/14/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Declaration of Code COmpliance Officer Fernando Gomez in support of Application for Abatement Warrant

01/14/2021: Declaration of Code COmpliance Officer Fernando Gomez in support of Application for Abatement Warrant

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Abatement Warrant Return on Application for Inspection/Abatement/Seizure Warrant of CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Proposed Order Extending Abatement Warrant on Application for Inspection/Abatement/Seizure Warrant of CITY OF PALM SPRINGS; Filed By: CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of City Engineer Joel Montalvo In Support of Application for Extension of Abatement Warrant; Filed By: CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Judicial Notice.; Filed By: CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Code COmpliance Officer Fernando Gomez in support of Application for Abatement Warrant; Filed By: CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application/Declaration/Petition for Inspection/Abatement/Seizure Warrant; Filed By: CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed By: CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketFilings: Application for Inspection/Abatement/Seizure Warrant of CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HASSELL MICHELINA J.