This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/15/2022 at 16:56:44 (UTC).

CHAVEZ vs SPRIGGS

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 CHAVEZ filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against SPRIGGS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Craig Riemer and Chad Firetag. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4227

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Craig Riemer

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELOY CHAVEZ

DONNA CHAVEZ

Defendants

SCOTT B. SPRIGGS

KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

MICHAEL F. MOON

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT SALL

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000)

09/17/2021: Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000)

Proof of Service by Mail re: MOTION BY DEFENDANTS SCOTT B. SPRIGGS, KINKLE RODIGER SPRIGGS PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, AND MICHAEL F. MOON FOR PEREMP-TORY DISQUALIFICATION OF THE HONORABLE CRAIG RIEMER; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF [C.C.P. 170.6] on

12/23/2021: Proof of Service by Mail re: MOTION BY DEFENDANTS SCOTT B. SPRIGGS, KINKLE RODIGER SPRIGGS PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, AND MICHAEL F. MOON FOR PEREMP-TORY DISQUALIFICATION OF THE HONORABLE CRAIG RIEMER; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF [C.C.P. 170.6] on Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ

Notice of Document Return.

12/22/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

12/20/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

Motion by Defendants for Peremptory Disqualification of the Honorable Craig Riemer

12/20/2021: Motion by Defendants for Peremptory Disqualification of the Honorable Craig Riemer

Notice of Entry of Order Re Stay on Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ

12/14/2021: Notice of Entry of Order Re Stay on Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ

Notice of Document Return.

12/16/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Stipulation for Stay and Order

12/13/2021: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Stipulation for Stay and Order

Stipulation for Stay and Order

12/13/2021: Stipulation for Stay and Order

Proof of Service on Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ

10/21/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ

Proof of Service on Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ

10/06/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ

Proof of Service on Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ

10/04/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ

Proof of Service on Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ

10/04/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ

Notice of Department Assignment

09/17/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000)

09/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

09/17/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

09/17/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service by Mail re: MOTION BY DEFENDANTS SCOTT B. SPRIGGS, KINKLE RODIGER SPRIGGS PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, AND MICHAEL F. MOON FOR PEREMP-TORY DISQUALIFICATION OF THE HONORABLE CRAIG RIEMER; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF [C.C.P. 170.6] on Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ; Filed By: SCOTT B. SPRIGGS; KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Demurrer as to Cause(s) of Action Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint as to the Third, Fourth, and Fifth Causes of Action; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Taken off calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Motion by Defendants for Peremptory Disqualification of the Honorable Craig Riemer; Filed By: SCOTT B. SPRIGGS; KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION; MICHAEL F. MOON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Entry of Order Re Stay on Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ; Filed By: ELOY CHAVEZ; DONNA CHAVEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingType: Court Ruling re: Stipulation for Stay and Order; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Complete

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Stipulation for Stay and Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ; Filed By: ELOY CHAVEZ; DONNA CHAVEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ; Filed By: ELOY CHAVEZ; DONNA CHAVEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/17/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210917-00576.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ELOY CHAVEZ; DONNA CHAVEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ELOY CHAVEZ; DONNA CHAVEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ELOY CHAVEZ; DONNA CHAVEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000); Filed By: ELOY CHAVEZ; DONNA CHAVEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Professional Negligence (Over $25,000) of ELOY CHAVEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less