This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/25/2021 at 18:36:02 (UTC).

CHAVEZ vs CSI SUPPORT & DEVELOPMENT SERVICES

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 CHAVEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CSI SUPPORT DEVELOPMENT SERVICES. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3464

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENITA CHAVEZ

Defendants

CSI SUPPORT & DEVELOPMENT SERVICES

EUCALYPTUS TOWERS COOP

SILVIA DEL TORO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David M Esfeh, Esq

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Damages

07/26/2021: Complaint for Damages

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

07/26/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

07/26/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

08/06/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

08/06/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Document Return.

08/06/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Request for Dismissal

09/09/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

02/02/2022: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: BENITA CHAVEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/06/2021; Fine Description: Check #23003 Receipt No.: 20210806-00397.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: BENITA CHAVEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: BENITA CHAVEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: BENITA CHAVEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages; Filed By: BENITA CHAVEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BENITA CHAVEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSI SUPPORT AND DEVELOPMENT SERVICES, A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant