This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/13/2021 at 05:11:53 (UTC).

CHAN vs GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 CHAN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0161

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

YING HUA CHAN

Defendants

MARIBEL LOPEZ GONZALEZ

JUNA GONZALEZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Lee O'Connor

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned for County of Unsatisfied

06/11/2021: Writ of Possession Returned for County of Unsatisfied

Declaration in Support of issuance of Writ of Possession (RI-CI002)

05/24/2021: Declaration in Support of issuance of Writ of Possession (RI-CI002)

Judgment Unlawful Detainer; Honorable Randall D. White

05/21/2021: Judgment Unlawful Detainer; Honorable Randall D. White

Certificate of Electronic Recording Monitor CRC 2.952(d)

05/12/2021: Certificate of Electronic Recording Monitor CRC 2.952(d)

Minute Order: Court Trial Unlawful Detainer on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

05/12/2021: Minute Order: Court Trial Unlawful Detainer on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

Request for Entry of Default on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

05/10/2021: Request for Entry of Default on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

05/10/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

04/27/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

04/27/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

Request to Set Case for Trial Unlawful Detainer (UD-150)

04/27/2021: Request to Set Case for Trial Unlawful Detainer (UD-150)

Request for Entry of Default on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

04/27/2021: Request for Entry of Default on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

04/27/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

04/20/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

04/20/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

Notice of Department Assignment

04/08/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Clerks Notice of Unlawful Detainer Complaint

04/08/2021: Clerks Notice of Unlawful Detainer Complaint

Verification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

03/30/2021: Verification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations (Unlawful Detainer)

03/30/2021: Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations (Unlawful Detainer)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Writ of Possession Returned for County of Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/24/2021; Fine Description: Check #79814 Receipt No.: 20210524-00184.1; Paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration in Support of issuance of Writ of Possession (RI-CI002)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Possession; Applies to: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN; For/Against: For - STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN For - YING HUA CHAN Against - ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Against - JUNA GONZALEZ Against - MARIBEL LOPEZ GONZALEZ; Details; Writ Fee: $40.00; Possession: 82887 CRAWFORD DR, INDIO, CA 92201; Premises Address: 82887 Crawford Dr INDIO, CA, 92201; Writ of Possession Issued for County: Riverside on 05/24/2021 - expires on 11/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: 10 Year Judgment Expiration; Expiration Date: 05/12/2031; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment Unlawful Detainer; Honorable Randall D. White; Filed By: STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN; YING HUA CHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingType: Court Trial Unlawful Detainer on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4; Disposition: Held - Trial in progress

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Ordered; Type: Possession; Applies to: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN; For/Against: For - STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN For - YING HUA CHAN Against - MARIBEL LOPEZ GONZALEZ Against - JUNA GONZALEZ Against - ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; Details; Possession: 82887 Crawford Dr, Indio, CA 92201; Premises Address: 82887 Crawford Dr INDIO, CA, 92201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Electronic Recording Monitor CRC 2.952(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court Trial Unlawful Detainer on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper in unlawful detainer amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $270.00; Paid: $270.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/08/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0230 Receipt No.: 20210408-00019.1; Paid: $270.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerks Notice of Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Verification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN; Filed By: STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN; YING HUA CHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations (Unlawful Detainer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons - Unlawful Detainer - Eviction Issued and Filed (SUM-130); Filed By: STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN; YING HUA CHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN; YING HUA CHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN; YING HUA CHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000); Filed By: STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN; YING HUA CHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of STEVEN HSUEH WEN CHAN; Disposition: Court Finding 05/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEE OCONNOR