This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 10:10:43 (UTC).

CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC vs PACIFIC STRUCFRAME LLC

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PACIFIC STRUCFRAME LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2593

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC

Defendants

RICK HANNA

PACIFIC STRUCFRAME LLC

JOHN B HANNA

RIFKY B. HANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond Asher Policar

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC

07/16/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC

Notice of Case Management Conference

06/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

06/18/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

06/08/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

06/08/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/08/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Verified Complaint for Breach of Promissory Note; Breach of Open Book Account; and Breach of Written Personal Guaranties

06/08/2021: Verified Complaint for Breach of Promissory Note; Breach of Open Book Account; and Breach of Written Personal Guaranties

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Taken off calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC; Filed By: CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC; Filed By: CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC; Filed By: CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/18/2021; Fine Description: Check #D4015713 Receipt No.: 20210618-00194.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Verified Complaint for Breach of Promissory Note; Breach of Open Book Account; and Breach of Written Personal Guaranties; Filed By: CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHAMPION LUMBER COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLICAR, RAYMOND A