This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/25/2023 at 10:20:54 (UTC).

CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION vs COLUMBIA STEEL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 CCC STEEL, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COLUMBIA STEEL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel Bustamante. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0894

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Manuel Bustamante

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

COLUMBIA STEEL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

DESERT COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER NG

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file request for entry of default of all defendants pursuant to CRC 3.110(g)

08/22/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file request for entry of default of all defendants pursuant to CRC 3.110(g)

Certificate of Mailing

08/22/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

08/22/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

08/03/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

07/21/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Order Directing Service of Process on Defendant Columbia Steel, Inc. by Delivery to the California Secretary of State on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

06/27/2023: Order Directing Service of Process on Defendant Columbia Steel, Inc. by Delivery to the California Secretary of State on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Application to/for ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT COLUMBIA STEEL, INC. BY DELIVERY TO THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

06/27/2023: Application to/for ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT COLUMBIA STEEL, INC. BY DELIVERY TO THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Notice of Document Return.

06/27/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Request for Dismissal

06/23/2023: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

06/01/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

06/01/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

06/01/2023: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

04/19/2023: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

Notice of Commencement of Action on Stop Payment Notice

03/07/2023: Notice of Commencement of Action on Stop Payment Notice

Notice of Department Assignment

02/24/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

02/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

02/24/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Certificate of Counsel.

02/17/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/11/2023

HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file request for entry of default of all defendants pursuant to CRC 3.110(g) as to CHRISTOPHER NG; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Completed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file request for entry of default of all defendants pursuant to CRC 3.110(g)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/03/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230803-01636.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION; Filed By: CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
02/24/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/24/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230224-01226.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/24/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230224-01226.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for: Breach of Contract; on Common Counts; Enforcement of Claim on Public Works Payment Bond; Enforcement of Claim on Stop Payment Notice; Filed By: CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023

DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of CCC STEEL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less