This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/05/2022 at 01:12:54 (UTC).

CASHCALL INC. vs MORENO

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 CASHCALL INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MORENO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2402

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASHCALL INC

Defendant

REBECCA MORENO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TREVOR G. MORAN

 

Court Documents

Verified Complaint for Breach of Contract and Common Counts

06/17/2022: Verified Complaint for Breach of Contract and Common Counts

Summons Issued and Filed

06/17/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

06/17/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Department Assignment

06/21/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000) of CASHCALL INC.

06/21/2022: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000) of CASHCALL INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/21/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220621-00236.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/21/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220621-00236.1; Paid: $255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000) of CASHCALL INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 08/16/2022; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CASHCALL INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CASHCALL INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CASHCALL INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Verified Complaint for Breach of Contract and Common Counts; Filed By: CASHCALL INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000) of CASHCALL INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASHCALL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trevor G Moran