This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/02/2023 at 12:01:09 (UTC).

LLAMAS-MONTANO vs HEMET STATE PLAZA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/21/2023 LLAMAS-MONTANO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HEMET STATE PLAZA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Angel M. Bermudez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7035

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Angel M. Bermudez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSE TRINIDAD LLAMAS-MONTANO

Defendant

HEMET STATE PLAZA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELL EVAN BERMAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

08/21/2023: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

08/21/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/21/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

08/21/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

08/28/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

08/28/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

02/26/2024

HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/28/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230828-02409.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/28/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230828-02409.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 10/20/2023; Status: Active

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: JOSE TRINIDAD LLAMAS-MONTANO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JOSE TRINIDAD LLAMAS-MONTANO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JOSE TRINIDAD LLAMAS-MONTANO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JOSE TRINIDAD LLAMAS-MONTANO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JOSE TRINIDAD LLAMAS-MONTANO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less