This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/19/2023 at 02:22:53 (UTC).

RANDLES vs MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 05/05/2023 RANDLES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric A Keen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2385

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eric A Keen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNIFER LIANE RANDLES

Defendants

ALLIED UNIVERSAL EXECUTIVE PROTECTION AND INTELLIGENCE SERVICES, INC

WILLIAM MARTINEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL DESANTIS

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Damages

05/05/2023: Complaint for Damages

Summons Issued and Filed

05/05/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/05/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

05/05/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

05/08/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

05/08/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JENNIFER LIANE RANDLES

05/09/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JENNIFER LIANE RANDLES

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/11/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230511-01282.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JENNIFER LIANE RANDLES; Filed By: JENNIFER LIANE RANDLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/08/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230508-01035.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/08/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230508-01035.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 07/04/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages; Filed By: JENNIFER LIANE RANDLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JENNIFER LIANE RANDLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JENNIFER LIANE RANDLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JENNIFER LIANE RANDLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JENNIFER LIANE RANDLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less