This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/25/2023 at 17:54:13 (UTC).

GREEN TOWNE, INC. vs RENOVA ENERGY CORP.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2023 GREEN TOWNE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RENOVA ENERGY CORP. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4116

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREEN TOWNE, INC

Defendants

SUNWEST BANK

MEDITERRANEAN HOLDINGS, LLC

RENOVA ENERGY CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHANIE C GOLDSTEIN

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff Green Towne, Inc.'s Complaint for: 1. Foreclosure of Mechanics Lien; and 2) Breach of Contract

08/24/2023: Plaintiff Green Towne, Inc.'s Complaint for: 1. Foreclosure of Mechanics Lien; and 2) Breach of Contract

Summons

08/24/2023: Summons

Certificate of Counsel.

08/24/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

08/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

08/24/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

10/24/2023: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

03/19/2024

HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of GREEN TOWNE, INC. GREEN TOWNE, INC.; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2024

HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/24/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230824-02099.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/24/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230824-02099.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff Green Towne, Inc.'s Complaint for: 1. Foreclosure of Mechanics Lien; and 2) Breach of Contract; Filed By: GREEN TOWNE, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons; Filed By: GREEN TOWNE, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: GREEN TOWNE, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: GREEN TOWNE, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of GREEN TOWNE, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less