This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/26/2023 at 08:19:16 (UTC).

JOSEPH DANESH DDS INC vs FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA INC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 JOSEPH DANESH DDS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James Hodgkins. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0673

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

James Hodgkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPH DANESH DDS INC

Defendants

MCCARTHY, BURGESS & WOLFF INC

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA INC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) – Over $1,500 up to $5,000

05/26/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) – Over $1,500 up to $5,000

Notice of Department Assignment

06/07/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Request for Dismissal

07/19/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

07/24/2023

HearingType: Hearing on Small Claims; Judicial Officer: James Hodgkins; Location/Courtroom: Department S101; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: JOSEPH DANESH DDS INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Small Claims filing claim for more than $1,500 but less than or equal to $5,000 (CCP116.230B2); Amount: $50.00; Paid: $50.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/07/2023; Fine Description: Check #4304 Receipt No.: 20230607-00053.1; Paid: $50.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) Over $1,500 up to $5,000; Filed By: JOSEPH DANESH DDS INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketFilings: Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by JOSEPH DANESH DDS INC; Disposition: Request for Dismissal 07/19/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less