This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/10/2023 at 08:41:01 (UTC).

FRIEDMAN vs CITRUS GARDENS LEASING LLC

Case Summary

On 06/27/2023 FRIEDMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITRUS GARDENS LEASING LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Raquel A. Marquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5083

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Raquel A. Marquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBIN WISNIEWSKI

BEATRICE FRIEDMAN

Defendants

CITRUS GARDENS LEASING LLC

DEBRA BETH JONES

MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC

CITRUS GARDENS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUZANNE M. VOAS

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

06/27/2023: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

06/27/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Declaration of Robin Wisniewski Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 377.32 and Welfare & Institutions Code 15657.3

06/27/2023: Declaration of Robin Wisniewski Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 377.32 and Welfare & Institutions Code 15657.3

Certificate of Counsel.

06/27/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/27/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

07/06/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

07/06/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BEATRICE FRIEDMAN, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, ROBIN WISNIEWSKI

07/06/2023: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BEATRICE FRIEDMAN, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, ROBIN WISNIEWSKI

170.6 CCP

07/06/2023: 170.6 CCP

 

Docket Entries

01/03/2024

HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230706-00375.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230706-00375.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230706-00533.1; Paid: $150.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230706-00533.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230706-01642.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BEATRICE FRIEDMAN, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, ROBIN WISNIEWSKI; Filed By: BEATRICE FRIEDMAN; ROBIN WISNIEWSKI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: 170.6 CCP; Filed By: BEATRICE FRIEDMAN; ROBIN WISNIEWSKI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 08/26/2023; Status: Active

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: BEATRICE FRIEDMAN; ROBIN WISNIEWSKI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: BEATRICE FRIEDMAN; ROBIN WISNIEWSKI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Robin Wisniewski Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 377.32 and Welfare & Institutions Code 15657.3; Filed By: BEATRICE FRIEDMAN; ROBIN WISNIEWSKI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: BEATRICE FRIEDMAN; ROBIN WISNIEWSKI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: BEATRICE FRIEDMAN; ROBIN WISNIEWSKI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BEATRICE FRIEDMAN, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, ROBIN WISNIEWSKI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less