This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/31/2023 at 13:03:08 (UTC).

CERROS vs FCA US, LLC.

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 CERROS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric A Keen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2633

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eric A Keen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LETICIA CERROS

ADALBERTO CERROS

Defendants

FCA US, LLC

PERRIS VALLEY AUTO CENTER, INC.

PERRIS VALLEY DODGE JEEP CHRYSLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIONNA DOLIN

Defendant Attorneys

NEJLA NASSIRIAN Jeffery Fadeff

DEBRA STEPHENS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS

06/29/2023: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS

06/29/2023: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS

Defendant FCA US LLC'S Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS

06/21/2023: Defendant FCA US LLC'S Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS

Proof of Service by Mail re: Declaration 170.6 on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS

06/14/2023: Proof of Service by Mail re: Declaration 170.6 on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS

Proof of Service re: Declaration on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS

06/15/2023: Proof of Service re: Declaration on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS

Notice of Document Return.

06/15/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS

06/13/2023: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS

Notice of Document Return.

06/14/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

06/14/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

06/09/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

Declaration (Section 170.6 CCP)

06/05/2023: Declaration (Section 170.6 CCP)

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS

05/24/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS

Notice of Department Assignment

05/19/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

05/19/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

05/19/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

05/19/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS

05/19/2023: COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/30/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230630-00407.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/30/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230630-00407.1; Paid: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/30/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230630-00407.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS; Filed By: PERRIS VALLEY AUTO CENTER, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS; Filed By: PERRIS VALLEY AUTO CENTER, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/22/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230622-02024.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/22/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230622-02024.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant FCA US LLC'S Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS; Filed By: FCA US, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/16/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230616-01325.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS; Filed By: ADALBERTO CERROS; LETICIA CERROS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/19/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230519-01545.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/19/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230519-01545.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS; Filed By: ADALBERTO CERROS; LETICIA CERROS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ADALBERTO CERROS; LETICIA CERROS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ADALBERTO CERROS; LETICIA CERROS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ADALBERTO CERROS; LETICIA CERROS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ADALBERTO CERROS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less