This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/26/2023 at 10:13:23 (UTC).

HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION vs COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/11/2023 HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Harold W. Hopp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4311

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Harold W. Hopp

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Respondents

ALL PERSONS INTERESTED IN THE MATTER OF CVWD'S ADOPTION OF REPLENISHMENT ASSESSMENT CHARGE RATES FOR FISCAL YEAR 2024 AND ALL PROCEEDINGS RELATED THERETO

COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jeffrey Lee Costell Sara Marie McDuffie

 

Court Documents

Notice of Status Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

08/21/2023: Notice of Status Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Notice of Department Assignment

08/21/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

08/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

Verified Petition and Complaint

08/11/2023: Verified Petition and Complaint

Certificate of Counsel.

08/11/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

08/11/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Class Action Case Management Order #1 on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

08/24/2023: Class Action Case Management Order #1 on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

08/24/2023: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Class Action Case Management Order #1

08/24/2023: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Class Action Case Management Order #1

Notice of Document Return.

08/25/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Application for Order for Publication of Summons on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

08/30/2023: Application for Order for Publication of Summons on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Proof of Service for; Application for Order for Publication of Summons; Declaration of Merit; and [Proposed] Order on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

08/25/2023: Proof of Service for; Application for Order for Publication of Summons; Declaration of Merit; and [Proposed] Order on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

Notice of Document Return.

09/08/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

09/11/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

09/12/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Related Case

09/13/2023: Notice of Related Case

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Civil on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

09/13/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Civil on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/26/2023

HearingType: Status Hearing re: Writ of Mandate (Mandamus); Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/13/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230913-00717.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/13/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230913-02426.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Related Case; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Civil on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application for Order for Publication of Summons on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/29/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230829-01789.1; Paid: $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/21/2023; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: 20230821-00133.1; Paid: $1,000.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/23/2023; Fine Description: Void / Reversal Receipt No.: 20230821-00133.2; Paid: $1,000.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/23/2023; Fine Description: Check #187242 Receipt No.: 20230823-00021.1; Paid: $1,000.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/21/2023; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: 20230821-00133.1; Paid: $450.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/23/2023; Fine Description: Void / Reversal Receipt No.: 20230821-00133.2; Paid: $450.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/23/2023; Fine Description: Check #187242 Receipt No.: 20230823-00021.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Status Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010); Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Verified Petition and Complaint; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023

DocketFilings: Petition for Writ of Mandate of HOWARD JARVIS TAXPAYERS ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less