This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/20/2023 at 02:35:09 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY vs RUSSI

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RUSSI. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carol A. Greene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2624

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carol A. Greene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

PATRICK RUSSI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK NIVINSKUS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR MOTOR VEHICLE PROPERTY DAMAGE AND PERSONAL INJURY

05/18/2023: COMPLAINT FOR MOTOR VEHICLE PROPERTY DAMAGE AND PERSONAL INJURY

Summons Issued and Filed

05/18/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/18/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Statement of Damages (CIV-050)

05/18/2023: Statement of Damages (CIV-050)

Certificate of Counsel.

05/18/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

05/19/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

05/19/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/19/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230519-00854.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/19/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230519-00854.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 07/17/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: COMPLAINT FOR MOTOR VEHICLE PROPERTY DAMAGE AND PERSONAL INJURY; Filed By: PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Statement of Damages (CIV-050); Filed By: PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of PROGRESSIVE WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less