This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/24/2023 at 09:15:38 (UTC).

GUTIERREZ vs ERICSSON INC.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2023 GUTIERREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ERICSSON INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Harold W. Hopp. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3202

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Harold W. Hopp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSUE GUTIERREZ

Defendant

ERICSSON INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AUBRY WAND

 

Court Documents

Complaint Class Action 1. Failure to Provide Meal Periods

06/22/2023: Complaint Class Action 1. Failure to Provide Meal Periods

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

06/22/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

06/22/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

06/22/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

06/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

06/23/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ

06/27/2023: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ

Class Action Case Management Order #1 on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ

06/30/2023: Class Action Case Management Order #1 on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ

06/30/2023: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ

Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Class Action Case Management Order #1

06/30/2023: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Class Action Case Management Order #1

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ

07/18/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ

08/02/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ

Notice of Deposit of Advance Jury Fees by Plaintiff on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ

08/02/2023: Notice of Deposit of Advance Jury Fees by Plaintiff on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ

Defendant's Notice to Adverse Party and Superior Court of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ

08/16/2023: Defendant's Notice to Adverse Party and Superior Court of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/22/2023

HearingType: Case Management Conference - Complex; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/17/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230817-00591.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant's Notice to Adverse Party and Superior Court of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ; Filed By: ERICSSON INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/02/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230802-02299.1; Paid: $150.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/02/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230802-02299.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ; Filed By: JOSUE GUTIERREZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Deposit of Advance Jury Fees by Plaintiff on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ; Filed By: JOSUE GUTIERREZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/18/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230718-00211.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ; Filed By: JOSUE GUTIERREZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

HearingType: Court Ruling re: Class Action Case Management Order #1; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Completed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
06/23/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/23/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230623-01082.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/23/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230623-01082.1; Paid: $1,000.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/23/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230623-01082.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Class Action 1. Failure to Provide Meal Periods; Filed By: JOSUE GUTIERREZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010); Filed By: JOSUE GUTIERREZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JOSUE GUTIERREZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JOSUE GUTIERREZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of JOSUE GUTIERREZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less