This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/17/2023 at 10:47:53 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY vs CITADEL COMMUNICATIONS GROUP CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/14/2023 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITADEL COMMUNICATIONS GROUP CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Angel M. Bermudez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2827

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Angel M. Bermudez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Defendants

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA, INC

CITADEL COMMUNICATIONS GROUP CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENUS K. NOURAFCHAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

04/14/2023: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

04/14/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/14/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

04/14/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

04/25/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

04/25/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

05/01/2023: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

05/01/2023: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/08/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230508-01172.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/25/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230425-00605.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/25/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230425-00605.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less