This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/13/2023 at 12:09:10 (UTC).

TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC. vs P.G.E.K. INC.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2023 TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against P G E K INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1881

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Defendants

P.G.E.K. INC.

WABA GRILL @ RIVERSIDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMOTHY CARL AIRES

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Breach of Contract

04/13/2023: Complaint for Breach of Contract

Certificate of Counsel.

04/13/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

04/13/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000)

04/13/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

04/13/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000) of TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

05/09/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000) of TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/10/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230510-01098.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000) of TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.; Filed By: TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/13/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230413-01867.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/13/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230413-01867.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract; Filed By: TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000) of TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less